These lessons are based on Vedic Maths” principles and other maths tricks. These principles are general in nature and can be applied in many ways and very very useful in commercial mathematics. I hope all of you like these lessons and make your calculation faster and save a lot of time in daily calculations and examinations or any entrance test like CAT /IIT /BANK PO /ENGINEERING ENTRANCE TEST/PMT /MCA ENTRANCE TEST/MBA ENTRANCE TEST etc
Method for multiplying numbers where the first figures are the same and the last figures add to1 0. 42 x 48 = Both numbers here start with 4 and the last figures (2 and 8) add up to 10. just multiply 4 by 5 (the next number up) to get 20 for the first part of the answer. And we multiply the last figures: 2 x 8 = 16 to get the last part of the answer Method for multiplying numbers where the first figures add up 10 and the last figures are same 44X64 Here first figures are 4 and 6 and there add up 10 and unit figures of both number are same Just multiplying the last figures 4×4=16 Put it at right-hand side Again multiplying the first figures and add common digit(4×6 )+4=24+4=28 put it at left-hand side Now we get required answer2816
Similarly, 36×76, 6X6 =36 right-hand side, (3×7)+6= 21+6=27 left-hand side Required answer is 2736 NOTE If multiplication of last figures is less than 10 add zero before unit digit Ex 81×21, 1×1=01,( 8×2)+1= 16+1=17 Required answer 1701 Method for multiplying numbers where the first number”s add up10 and the second number’s digits are same 46X55 Here the first number adds up is 10 and the second number “s digits are common i. e 5 Just multiplying last figures of both numbers 6×5 =30 put it at right-hand side Again multiplying first figures of both numbers and add common digit of the second number (4×5)+5 =20+5 =25 put it left-hand side
Lesson1 Multiplying numbers just over 100. 108 x 109 = 11772
The answer is in two parts: 117 and 72, 117 is just 108 + 9 (or 109 + 8), and 72 is just 8 x 9. Similarly 107 x 106 = 11342
HOW USEFUL IS THIS CALCULATION!
EXAMPLE 1 Compute the amount and the compound interest on Rs 10000. 00 on 2. years at4%per annum. Now 4×4=16 and 4+4=8 put 10 it becomes Rs 10816. 00 How simple! o calculation no extra time! Practice Test 1 Solve mentally these questions Note down your calculation time by watch (Suggested time 90 seconds) 22 X 28 35 X 35 48 X 42 73 X 33 12 X 92 48 X 28 28 X 22 37 X 88 91 X 66 118 X105 109 X108 112 X106 91 X 99 33 X 37 55X55 Now check your answer with the help of a calculator
At Solution Essays, we are determined to deliver high-quality papers to our clients at a fair price. To ensure this happens effectively, we have developed 5 beneficial guarantees. This guarantees will ensure you enjoy using our website which is secure and easy to use.
Most companies do not offer a money-back guarantee but with Solution Essays, it’s either a quality paper or your money back. Our customers are assured of high-quality papers and thus there are very rare cases of refund requests due to quality concern.Read more
All our papers are written from scratch and according to your specific paper instructions. This minimizes any chance of plagiarism. The papers are also passed through a plagiarism-detecting software thus ruling out any chance of plagiarism.Read more
We offer free revisions in all orders delivered as long as there is no alteration in the initial order instruction. We will revise your paper until you are fully satisfied with the order delivered to you.Read more
All data on our website is stored as per international data protection rules. This ensures that any personal data you share with us is stored safely. We never share your personal data with third parties without your consent.Read more